THE CITY OF PORTSMOUTH AND DISTRICT ORGANISTS' ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 280146
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £640 £569 £881 £1.03k £565
Total expenditure £750 £440 £976 £1.03k £400
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A