FRIENDS OF MEOPHAM COMMUNITY ACADEMY

Charity number: 280163
Charity reporting is overdue by 1051 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 Overdue Overdue by 320 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Overdue Overdue by 320 days
Annual return 31 August 2018 Overdue Overdue by 686 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Overdue Overdue by 686 days
Annual return 31 August 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1051 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1051 days
Annual return 31 August 2016 03 July 2017 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2015 22 November 2016 145 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2015 Not Required