FRIENDS OF MEOPHAM COMMUNITY ACADEMY

Charity number: 280163
Charity reporting is overdue by 1048 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2012 31/08/2013 31/08/2014 31/08/2015 31/08/2016
Total gross income £5.85k £12.50k £9.26k £7.52k £7.35k
Total expenditure £8.71k £12.82k £9.84k £7.35k £7.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A