THE LEWIS FAMILY CHARITY SETTLEMENT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
sPENDING ON CHARITABLE CAUSES MONIES RAISED FROM ANNUAL INTEREST ON FAMILY RUN CHARITABLE TRUST
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 09 July 1980: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOANNA MIRIAM ANDREWS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANDRE JEAN ANKER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SIMON ANDREW LEWIS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/12/2019 | 05/12/2020 | 05/12/2021 | 05/12/2022 | 05/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £656 | £641 | £11 | £555 | £1.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £980 | £850 | £0 | £100 | £380 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 December 2023 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 December 2022 | 21 January 2024 | 108 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 December 2021 | 11 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 December 2020 | 18 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 December 2019 | 16 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 20TH FEBRUARY 1980
Charitable objects
SUCH PURPOSES THAT ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES INCLUDING THE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES OF THE ALYN HOSPITAL FOR CRIPPED CHILDREN IN JERUSALEM AS THE CHARITABLE TRUSTEES SHALL APPOINT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 GLOUCESTER COURT MEWS
HIGH STREET
WITNEY
OX28 6HX
- Phone:
- 01993704557
- Email:
- ankerwitney99@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
not.applicable
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window