Accounts and annual returns THE ILKETSHALL ST ANDREW COMMUNITY COUNCIL

Charity number: 280243
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2021 30 July 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2020 07 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2019 11 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2018 13 October 2019 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2017 16 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2017 Not Required