WROXHAM AND HOVETON LIONS CLUB CHARITY TRUST FUND

Charity number: 280331
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 04 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 04 February 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 24 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 24 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 12 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 22 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 17 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 27 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2016 02 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 06 December 2016 On time Download