Accounts and annual returns THE GARDEN ESTATES ASSOCIATION OF PETTS WOOD

Charity number: 280397
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 12 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 04 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 04 September 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 15 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 15 July 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 26 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

03 July 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 24 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

24 May 2017 On time Download Open in new window