Financial history 1ST HORRINGER SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 280460
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £15.31k £15.30k £18.78k £16.86k £13.37k
Total expenditure £15.93k £13.03k £20.94k £7.88k £12.26k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £10.00k £1.21k