STOWMARKET CHORALE

Charity number: 280488
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021
Total gross income £13.44k £15.93k £26.61k £20.25k £4.12k
Total expenditure £17.88k £17.08k £16.31k £12.68k £6.30k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £500 £1.05k £1.40k N/A