CROUCH VALLEY DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 280514
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Education/training activities in respect of scouting

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £64,099
Total expenditure: £80,298

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Essex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 July 1980: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ANDREW AUSTIN Chair
None on record
Matthew Buckley Trustee 01 January 2024
2ND RAYLEIGH (HOLY TRINITY) SCOUT GROUP
Received: On time
Mark Martin Trustee 01 January 2024
None on record
David Louis Offord Trustee 01 June 2022
None on record
Zoe Read Trustee 14 October 2020
None on record
Helen Jane Kalloo Trustee 06 October 2019
None on record
Paul Andrew Stafford Trustee 18 December 2018
None on record
Mark Stephen Gibson Trustee 06 October 2016
None on record
SAM BLUNDELL Trustee 16 August 2013
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £42.79k £50.88k £47.80k £33.64k £64.10k
Total expenditure £48.05k £57.87k £33.62k £70.66k £80.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £42.97k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 20 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 20 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 30 March 2024 59 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 30 March 2024 59 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 20 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 20 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 02 March 2022 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 02 March 2022 30 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 30 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
22 Poplar Road
Rayleigh
SS6 8SL
Phone:
01268776904
Website:

No information available