Trustees ST HELENA HOSPICE LIMITED

Charity number: 280919
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Timothy Field Trustee 16 December 2021
OPEN ROAD VISIONS
Received: On time
James McCarthy Trustee 05 August 2021
None on record
Catherine Morgan Trustee 27 November 2020
None on record
Dr Frances Catherine Hyde Trustee 19 September 2019
None on record
Catherine Louise Bhuiya Trustee 08 August 2019
None on record
Professor Nigel Pye Trustee 07 June 2018
None on record
KENNETH NIGEL ROLLS Trustee 01 March 2017
None on record
Mary Northrop Trustee 17 December 2015
None on record
DAVID CRESSWELL Trustee 10 December 2012
None on record
KENNETH JOHN ALDRED Trustee 10 December 2012
None on record
DR MILNE Trustee
None on record
JOHN HAWKINS Trustee
None on record