THE LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE BRIDPORT HOSPITALS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To supplement the service given by Bridport Hospital for patients and staff by the provision of facilities and equipment which fall outside NHS funding priorities. To raise funds and receive gifts, donations and legacies. To recruit voluntary workers for the coffee shop and trolley service to the wards.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Dorset
Governance
- 11 September 1980: Standard registration
- 18 January 2023: Funds received from 229199 CHANCERY HOUSE
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Chris Munden | Chair | 12 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Aldom | Trustee | 07 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Heather Joy Purse | Trustee | 08 May 2017 |
|
|||||
Rev PHILIP JAMES RINGER | Trustee | 15 May 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.15k | £2.19k | £6.75k | £51.39k | £34.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.59k | £7.53k | £1.56k | £15.23k | £3.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 26 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 March 2022 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 February 2021 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9TH SEPTEMBER 1980 AS AMENDED 12 MAY 1994 AS AMENDED 13 MAY 2002
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PATIENTS AND FORMER PATIENTS OF THE BRIDPORT HOSPITALS AND OTHER INVALIDS IN THE COMMUNITY WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED, INFIRM OR IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, AND, GENERALLY, TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE SAID HOSPITALS.
Area of benefit
BRIDPORT
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 Elwell
BRIDPORT
Dorset
DT6 4DX
- Phone:
- 01308 422218
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
none.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window