THE NORWICH DIOCESAN ASSOCIATION OF RINGERS BELL RESTORATION FUND

Charity number: 281013
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £3.52k £5.42k £3.40k £5.01k £3.75k
Total expenditure £4.92k £5.32k £12.66k £11.09k £4.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A