Friends Of Saint Lucia International

Charity number: 281188
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 13 November 2020 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 04 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 18 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 08 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 19 February 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required