THE FRIENDS OF BURLEY PARISH CHURCH

Charity number: 281298
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 14 February 2021 106 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 06 January 2020 67 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 23 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 27 November 2017 27 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required