BATH CANCER UNIT APPEAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve sickness by supporting the work of the Oncology and Radiotherapy Unit at The Royal United Hospital Bath and other health units.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bath And North East Somerset
Governance
- 19 December 1980: Standard registration
No other names
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL DENIS TAYLOR | Chair | 17 May 2017 |
|
|||||
Sandra Pinner | Trustee | 17 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
ALAN WEBB | Trustee | 17 May 2017 |
|
|||||
MICHAEL PHILIP COOMBS | Trustee | 14 August 2012 |
|
|||||
SUZANNE COPPIN | Trustee |
|
||||||
CAROLINE ANN GILLEECE | Trustee |
|
||||||
JANE ELLEN MARGETTS | Trustee |
|
||||||
LESLIE ROBERT DYMOND | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES OF ASSOCIATION ADOPTED 11TH AUGUST 1980 AS AMENDED 18TH MARCH 1992
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SICKNESS BY RAISING MONEY TO PURCHASE EQUIPMENT AND PROVIDE FACILITIES AT THE ONCOLOGY AND RADIOTHERAPY UNIT AT THE BATH ROYAL UNITED HOSPITAL NOT PROVIDED BY THE REGIONAL HEALTH AUTHORITY OR BY ANY NATIONAL HEALTH SERVICE TRUST WHICH ADMINISTERS AND GOVERNS THE BATH ROYAL UNITED HOSPITAL
Area of benefit
BATH ROYAL UNITED HOSPITAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
19A WESTWOOD ROAD
TROWBRIDGE
BA14 9BR
- Phone:
- 01225764441
- Email:
- chairman@bcusg.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window