Accounts and annual returns LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE WESTMINSTER MEMORIAL HOSPITAL, SHAFTESBURY

Charity number: 281419
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On time
Annual return 31 December 2018 31 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 31 October 2019 On time
Annual return 31 December 2017 09 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 09 July 2018 On time
Annual return 31 December 2016 18 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 18 July 2017 On time