THE CARNIVOROUS PLANT SOCIETY

Charity number: 281423
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 07 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 15 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 29 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 17 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 07 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 26 February 2018 26 days late Download