Financial history THE CARNIVOROUS PLANT SOCIETY

Charity number: 281423
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £8.91k £9.55k £9.69k £6.00k £5.80k
Total expenditure £7.01k £10.95k £12.01k £7.38k £1.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A