ST ELISABETH FOUNDATION LIMITED

Charity number: 281454
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2020 22 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2019 23 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 23 April 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 November 2018 14 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2017 13 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2016 21 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2016 21 February 2017 On time Download