ST ELISABETH FOUNDATION LIMITED

Charity number: 281454
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/11/2016 30/11/2017 30/11/2018 30/11/2019 30/11/2020
Total gross income £101.58k £15.32k £20.54k £26.69k £14.32k
Total expenditure £15.08k £13.87k £13.47k £9.52k £11.75k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A