SELSEY CANCER RELIEF FUND

Charity number: 281463
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2021 17 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2020 22 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2019 19 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2018 18 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 Not Required Download
Annual return 28 February 2017 05 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2017 23 August 2017 On time Download