SELSEY CANCER RELIEF FUND

Charity number: 281463
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 28/02/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020 28/02/2021
Total gross income £3.49k £3.69k £14.82k £3.58k £2.33k
Total expenditure £55 £7.50k £5.89k £1.50k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A