Financial history ST CECILIA'S SCHOOL PARENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 281503
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022
Total gross income £19.82k £18.04k £10.92k £3.41k £6.42k
Total expenditure £6.32k £22.01k £10.37k £10.91k £1.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A