THE MILDENHALL AND DISTRICT MUSEUM

Charity number: 281511
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 January 2021 08 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2020 04 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2020 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2019 04 June 2020 216 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2019 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2018 29 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2018 Not Required
Annual return 01 January 2017 04 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 01 January 2017 Not Required