Portesham Village Hall

Charity number: 281514
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 01 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 26 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 05 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 27 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

26 April 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 29 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required