CRANLEIGH ST JOHN DARBY AND JOAN CLUB

Charity number: 281546
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £1.54k £996 £1.50k £1.14k £0
Total expenditure £1.11k £1.12k £1.26k £598 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A