Accounts and annual returns THE GREEK ORTHODOX COMMUNITY OF ST DEMETRIOS OF EDMONTON

Charity number: 281574
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 27 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 27 October 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 28 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 19 February 2021 111 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 23 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 23 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 31 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 11 April 2019 162 days late Download Open in new window