Accounts and annual returns ANTRYVALE LTD

Charity number: 281620
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 March 2021 17 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 March 2021 17 December 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 March 2020 21 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 March 2020 21 December 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 March 2019 28 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 28 March 2018 28 January 2020 365 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 28 March 2017 22 May 2018 114 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 March 2017 Not Required