Financial history ANTRYVALE LTD

Charity number: 281620
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/03/2017 28/03/2018 28/03/2019 28/03/2020 28/03/2021
Total gross income £12 £0 £25.00k £39.51k £37.00k
Total expenditure £252 £174 £25.66k £41.60k £59.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A