Financial history 1ST BLISWORTH SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 281629
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £10.78k £34.24k £8.88k £22.01k £3.42k
Total expenditure £8.33k £39.59k £8.14k £3.96k £22.30k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £20.64k N/A