ARTS NETWORK SUTTON

Charity number: 281641
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £10.09k £1.54k £5.04k £23.10k £17.11k
Total expenditure £14.82k £9.49k £3.14k £38.29k £14.39k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £9.00k N/A N/A £22.30k £13.50k