Trustees FAIRLEY HOUSE SCHOOL
Charity number: 281680

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alexandra Gamon | Trustee | 07 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ali Azam | Trustee | 14 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Shalom | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lawrence Dore | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tina Tietjen | Trustee | 01 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Dixon | Trustee | 22 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jolyon Luke | Trustee | 23 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
SARAH HAMILTON-FAIRLEY | Trustee | 25 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
PAUL BARNABY | Trustee | 20 June 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.