Accounts and annual returns CHOLESBURY-CUM-ST LEONARDS EVENING WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 281787
Charity reporting is overdue by 223 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 Overdue Overdue by 223 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Overdue Overdue by 223 days
Annual return 31 August 2020 31 August 2021 62 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 31 August 2021 427 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 23 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 12 February 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required