Financial history CHOLESBURY-CUM-ST LEONARDS EVENING WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 281787
Charity reporting is overdue by 213 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £2.01k £3.05k £2.38k £2.65k £2.14k
Total expenditure £2.09k £3.31k £2.61k £2.90k £1.64k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A