Trustees PLYMOUTH AGE CONCERN
Charity number: 281820
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Freyja Thomson | Trustee | 07 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicky Watt | Trustee | 07 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Majorie Creek | Trustee | 23 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
PETER BURROUGHS | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr STEPHEN JOHN HOBBS | Trustee | 16 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Bombieri | Trustee | 24 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Benny Wright | Trustee | 30 August 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.