HALESWORTH SWIMMING POOL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To use premises as a public swimming pool and allow schools and organisations to use the pool.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Suffolk
Governance
- 03 July 1981: Standard registration
- 04 October 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £971 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £971 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 22 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 26 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 25 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE DATED 31ST MARCH 1976
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSES OF A PUBLIC SWIMMING POOL AND AS A SWIMMING POOL FOR THE USE OF LOCAL SCHOOLS AND LOCAL ORGANISATIONS OUTSIDE OF PUBLIC HOURS FOR THE PURPOSES OF PHYSICAL TRAINING AND RECREATION AND SOCIAL DEVELOPMENT THROUGH THE MEDIUM OF RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF HALESWORTH AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF HALESWORTH AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window