Accounts and annual returns OXFORDSHIRE LOCAL HISTORY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 281851
Charity reporting is overdue by 26 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 26 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 26 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 06 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 12 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 12 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required