Financial history OXFORDSHIRE LOCAL HISTORY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 281851
Charity reporting is overdue by 23 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £4.84k £3.70k £4.54k £3.70k £4.19k
Total expenditure £2.93k £8.14k £3.19k £4.27k £4.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A