OXFORDSHIRE LOCAL HISTORY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 281851
Charity reporting is up to date

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MALCOLM GRAHAM Trustee
OXFORD HISTORICAL SOCIETY Charity reporting is up to date
PHILIP MORRIS Trustee 01 September 2014 None on record
MARGARET HAUSER Trustee 01 December 2012
OXFORD CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU Charity reporting is up to date
Dr NORMA ROSE AUBERTIN-POTTER Trustee 19 May 2011
KIDLINGTON AND DISTRICT HISTORICAL SOCIETY Charity reporting is up to date
Dr KATHRYN DAVIES Trustee 19 May 2011 None on record
CHRISTOPHER JOHN FANCE Trustee 11 May 2019
OXFORDSHIRE FAMILY HISTORY SOCIETY Charity reporting is up to date
LIZ WOOLLEY Trustee None on record
CHRISTOPHER HALL Trustee None on record
Dr SIMON TOWNLEY Trustee 01 April 2004 None on record