CONCORDANT BIBLE SOCIETY OF GREAT BRITAIN
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SUPPLIES RELIGIOUS LITERATURE AND TAPES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 December 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 02 April 1981: Standard registration
- 09 June 2017: Removed (Does not operate)
- CONCORDANT BIBLE SOCIETY (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2010 | 30/11/2011 | 30/12/2012 | 30/12/2013 | 30/12/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.98k | £7.65k | £6.58k | £5.81k | £7.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.14k | £7.57k | £917 | £666 | £5.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 December 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 December 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 December 2014 | 23 April 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 December 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 December 2013 | 30 April 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 December 2013 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 25TH NOVEMBER 1980
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER THE SCIENTIFIC INVESTIGATION AND THE DISSEMINATION FO THE RESULTS OF INVESTIGATION INTO THE ANCIENT MANUSCRIPTS OF THE INSPIRED SACRED SCRIPTURES AND TO PROPAGATE AND DISSEMINATE THE TRUTH OF THE SCRIPTURES REGARDLESS OF SECT OR DENOMINATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window