THE LAVINIA NORFOLK CENTRE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 281865
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 02 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 02 September 2020 125 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 24 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 08 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2016 04 August 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 Not Required