THE LAVINIA NORFOLK CENTRE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 281865
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £8.54k £13.34k £21.45k £9.95k £8.95k
Total expenditure £2.38k £9.23k £12.09k £11.34k £6.41k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A