2ND WARE (ST MARY'S) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 281875
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 02 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 02 October 2020 337 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 05 April 2019 156 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 05 April 2019 156 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 31 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 31 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 13 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 01 March 2017 121 days late Download