ST EDMUND HALL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 281972
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2020 02 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2019 09 June 2020 70 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2018 29 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2017 03 May 2018 33 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2016 13 February 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2016 Not Required