Financial history CORNWALL LEUKAEMIA TRUST

Charity number: 281979
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £43.69k £43.64k £51.45k £47.16k £28.24k
Total expenditure £16.60k £47.13k £64.38k £44.96k £88.57k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A