Trustees CORNWALL LEUKAEMIA TRUST
Charity number: 281979

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Anton Kruger | Chair | 01 April 1992 |
|
|
||||
John Botfield | Trustee | 07 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Howell | Trustee | 07 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ruth Witherall | Trustee | 07 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Vasanthi Furtado | Trustee | 09 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Tucker | Trustee | 09 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
DR Adam Forbes | Trustee | 20 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Vincent | Trustee | 10 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Wolstencroft | Trustee | 10 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Bryson Pottinger | Trustee | 01 November 2006 |
|
|
||||
DR Michael Desmond Creagh Dr | Trustee | 01 January 1996 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.