DESIGNER BOOKBINDERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
provides advocacy/advice/information, educates, sponsors and undertakes research on Bookbinding
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
11 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 16 March 1981: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stuart George Brockman | Chair | 29 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amy Marie Kitcherside | Trustee | 30 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kaori Maki | Trustee | 30 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ethel Mercedes | Trustee | 30 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Troy Christian Moore | Trustee | 05 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nesta Davies | Trustee | 05 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Richard Beadsmoore | Trustee | 06 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Angela James | Trustee | 05 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Ward-Sale | Trustee | 05 April 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £81.92k | £85.03k | £75.87k | £85.83k | £98.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £70.04k | £65.50k | £73.60k | £90.02k | £106.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 17 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 09 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
INSTRUMENT AND ARTICLES OF CONDUCT RATIFIED 3RD MAY 1969, AMENDED 13TH MAY 1972, REVISED 9TH DECEMBER 1978, AMENDED 24TH JANUARY 1981. AS AMENDED ON THE 24TH APRIL 1999
Charitable objects
1. THE PRESERVATION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE CRAFTS AND DESIGN OF FINE BOOKBINDING THROUGH THE ENCOURAGEMENT EXERCISE AND MAINTENANCE OF STANDARDS; AND 2. PROMOTION OF PUBLIC INTEREST IN THE CRAFT AND DESIGN OF FINE BOOKBINDING.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
29 Windrush Crescent
MALVERN
Worcestershire
WR14 2XG
- Phone:
- 01684438244
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window