RUSSELL QUINTON'S CHARITY

Charity number: 282173
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 02 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 02 February 2021 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2019 15 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 15 August 2019 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2018 15 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 15 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2017 08 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 08 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 05 April 2016 07 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 07 October 2016 On time Download