Financial history THE EUROPEAN ACADEMY GREAT BRITAIN

Charity number: 282198
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020 30/04/2021
Total gross income £64.43k £103.42k £69.76k £74.51k £0
Total expenditure £53.56k £92.99k £56.64k £79.27k £7.84k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A